To multiply numbers quickly, you can use various mental math tricks and techniques. Here are some tips to help you multiply numbers faster:

**Break Numbers Down**: Split the numbers into smaller, more manageable parts. For example, if you need to multiply 36 by 25, you can break it down into (30 * 25) + (6 * 25) and calculate each part separately.**Use Multiples of 10**: Multiplying by 10, 100, 1000, etc., is straightforward. Just add zeros to the end of the number. For example, 36 * 100 = 3600.**Memorize Multiplication Tables**: Knowing multiplication tables up to at least 10x10 will greatly speed up your calculations.**Apply the Distributive Property**: If you need to multiply a number by a sum, distribute the multiplication across the terms. For example, 4 * (7 + 3) can be calculated as (4 * 7) + (4 * 3).**Round and Adjust**: If you're working with larger numbers, rounding them to the nearest multiple of 10, 100, etc., can make the calculation easier. Adjust the result accordingly to account for the rounding.**Use Squaring Techniques**: If you need to square a number ending in 5, multiply the first part of the number by itself, then append 25 to the result. For example, 35 * 35 = (3 * 3) = 9, and then append 25, so the result is 1225.**Estimation**: Sometimes, you may not need an exact result. In such cases, use estimation to quickly get close to the answer. This can be particularly useful for mental math.**Practice**: Regular practice will improve your mental math skills and make you faster at multiplication.

Let's go through an example using some of these techniques:

**Example**: Calculate 47 * 12

- Break down the calculation: (40 * 12) + (7 * 12)
- Multiples of 10: 40 * 12 = 480
- Use memorized multiplication: 7 * 12 = 84
- Add the results: 480 + 84 = 564

So, 47 * 12 = 564.

With practice, you'll become more proficient at these techniques and be able to perform multiplication faster in your head.